+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 27, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB299 amended into LB432 by AM1151
On March 1, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Groene name added
On February 26, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Bostar name added
On February 9, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 25, 2021
On January 14, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Cavanaugh, M. name added
- Brewer name added
On January 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (4)
McDonnell
Type:
Primary Sponsor