+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 26, 2015
On May 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 20, 2015
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0
On May 7, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On May 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER111 adopted
On April 30, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER111 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER111
On April 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Health and Human Services AM447 adopted
On March 9, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Health and Human Services AM447 filed
- Placed on General File with AM447
On January 28, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 19, 2015
On January 16, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
Enrollment and Review ER111
adopted
Health and Human Services AM447
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor