+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 11, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 11, 2016
On February 5, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 05, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 41-3-5
On January 28, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER144 adopted
On January 14, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER144 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER144
On January 11, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM1426 adopted
- Schumacher AM1474 lost
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 7, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Schumacher AM1474 filed
On May 4, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM1426 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1426
On March 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Riepe priority bill
On January 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 20, 2015
On January 16, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
Schumacher AM1474
pending
Revenue AM1426
pending
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor