+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 07, 2013
On March 4, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Kolowski explanation of vote
On March 1, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 01, 2013
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 43-0-6
On February 25, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 21, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Lautenbaugh AM330 withdrawn
- Lautenbaugh AM330 filed
On February 8, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 7, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 4, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 16, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 25, 2013
On January 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 10, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Lautenbaugh AM330
withdrawn
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor