+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 26, 2015
On May 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 20, 2015
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
On May 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On May 5, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER103 adopted
On April 30, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER103 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER103
On April 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 19, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 12, 2015
On January 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 14, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Enrollment and Review ER103
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor