+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 23, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 22, 2014
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 17, 2014
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
- Chambers AM2943 withdrawn
- Chambers AM2943 filed
- Motion to return to Select File withdrawn
On April 9, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Chambers AM2832 withdrawn
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Nordquist AM2759 adopted
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 8, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Nordquist AM2759 filed
On April 7, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Chambers AM2832 filed
On April 2, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On April 1, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor