+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
On April 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On April 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 22, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 21, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 1, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Geist name added
On February 28, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Geist priority bill
On February 6, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Chambers MO7 failed
- Chambers MO7 pending
On January 13, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Chambers MO7 Rerefer to Judiciary Committee filed
- Notice of hearing for January 23, 2017
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 11, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor