+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB25 amended into LB265 by AM878
On March 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Judiciary AM605 filed
- Placed on General File with AM605
On February 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 25, 2015
On January 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 8, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Judiciary AM605
pending
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor