+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Halloran MO131 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed
On April 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Harr AM936 lost
On April 5, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Harr AM936 pending
- Harr AM936 filed
- Business and Labor AM301 pending
On March 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Harr priority bill
On February 28, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM301 filed
- Placed on General File with AM301
On January 13, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 23, 2017
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 11, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor