+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 26, 2015
On February 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 20, 2015
On February 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0
On February 17, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 11, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER15 adopted
On February 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER15 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER15
On February 4, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 16, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 26, 2015
On January 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
On January 14, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Enrollment and Review ER15
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor