+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 3, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on June 03, 2013
On May 30, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Seiler explanation of vote
On May 29, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 29, 2013
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
- Chambers FA128 withdrawn
On May 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Chambers FA128 filed
On May 22, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading Second
On May 21, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment
- Smith AM1379 adopted
- Returned to Select File for specific amendment
On May 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Smith AM1379 filed
On February 26, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 21, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Smith AM259 adopted
On February 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Smith AM259 filed
On February 11, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 8, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Pirsch name added
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Health and Human Services AM90 adopted
On February 6, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Health and Human Services AM90 filed
- Placed on General File with AM90
On January 17, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 24, 2013
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 15, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
Chambers FA128
withdrawn
Smith AM1379
adopted
Smith AM259
adopted
Health and Human Services AM90
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor