+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 15, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 14, 2018
On February 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 08, 2018
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
On January 31, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On January 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On January 17, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On January 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 14, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 09, 2017
On January 12, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor