+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB191 amended into LB289 by AM599
- Indefinitely postponed
- Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed
On May 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed
On March 13, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 30, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 23, 2017
On January 26, 2017 in the Legislature:
- McDonnell name added
On January 12, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor