+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 19, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 18, 2015
On March 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 12, 2015
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5
On March 5, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST12
On March 3, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Groene AM630 adopted
- Groene AM630 filed
- Brasch AM550 adopted
On February 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Brasch AM550 filed
On February 18, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 17, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- General Affairs AM237 adopted
On February 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- General Affairs AM237 filed
- Placed on General File with AM237
On January 16, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 26, 2015
On January 14, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to General Affairs Committee
On January 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor