+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (71)
On February 11, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 11, 2016
On February 5, 2016 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 34-14-1
- Schilz MO175 prevailed
- Schilz MO175 Invoke cloture filed
- Davis AM1886 withdrawn
- Motion to return to Select File failed
- Presented to Governor on February 05, 2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST55
On January 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Schilz AM1855 adopted
- Schilz AM1755 adopted
- Davis AM1848 withdrawn
- Schilz MO164 Invoke cloture filed
- Schilz MO164 prevailed
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Bloomfield AM1887 filed
On January 21, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Davis AM1886 filed
- Schilz AM1855 filed
- Davis AM1848 pending
- Davis AM1848 pending
- Davis AM1608 withdrawn
On January 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Davis AM1848 filed
On January 11, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Schilz priority bill
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Attorney General Opinion 15-013 to Schilz
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File with ER143
- Groene AM1634 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER143 adopted
- Bloomfield AM1636 lost
- Groene AM1634 pending
- Enrollment and Review ER143 filed
- McCoy FA79 filed
- Schilz MO140 Invoke cloture filed
- Schilz MO140 failed
- Davis AM1608 filed
- Schilz AM1755 filed
- McCoy FA79 withdrawn
On May 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Bloomfield MO136 failed
- McCoy MO120 withdrawn
- Agriculture AM495 pending
- Bloomfield MO134 Bracket until April 15, 2016 filed
- Bloomfield MO134 pending
- Bloomfield MO134 failed
- Schilz AM1263 withdrawn
- Schnoor AM1633 lost
- Bloomfield MO136 Reconsider the vote taken on AM1633 filed
- Agriculture AM495 pending
- Schnoor AM1672 pending
- Sullivan MO137 failed
- Schnoor AM1672 lost
- McCoy AM1685 lost
- Agriculture AM495 adopted
- Davis AM1635 adopted
- Schilz MO138 Invoke cloture filed
- Schilz MO138 prevailed
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Sullivan MO137 Recommit to Agriculture Committee filed
On May 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Groene AM1634 filed
On May 19, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Bloomfield AM1636 filed
On May 18, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Schnoor AM1633 filed
- McCoy AM1685 filed
- Schnoor AM1672 filed
- Davis AM1635 filed
On May 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- McCoy MO120 Bracket until June 5, 2015 filed
On April 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Schilz AM1263 filed
On March 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Schilz priority bill
On February 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Agriculture AM495 filed
- Placed on General File with AM495
On January 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 10, 2015
On January 14, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Agriculture Committee
On January 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (18)
Schilz AM1755
pending
Davis AM1608
pending
Schilz MO140
failed
McCoy FA79
withdrawn
Enrollment and Review ER143
adopted
Schilz MO138
prevailed
Sullivan MO137
failed
Bloomfield MO136
failed
Bloomfield MO134
failed
Groene AM1634
adopted
Bloomfield AM1636
lost
McCoy AM1685
lost
Davis AM1635
adopted
Schnoor AM1672
lost
Schnoor AM1633
lost
McCoy MO120
withdrawn
Schilz AM1263
withdrawn
Agriculture AM495
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor