+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 01, 2021
On January 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name added
On January 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 8, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (2)
Hansen, M.
Type:
Primary Sponsor