+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 20, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 20, 2013
On March 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 14, 2013
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4
On March 6, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 4, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On February 19, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 12, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 6, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 22, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 29, 2013
On January 16, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor