+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
On April 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 44-2-3
On April 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Schumacher AM871 lost
- Schumacher AM871 filed
On March 31, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 28, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Revenue AM141 adopted
On March 7, 2017 in the Legislature:
- McDonnell name added
- Smith priority bill
On February 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM141 filed
- Placed on General File with AM141
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 25, 2017
On January 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 9, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor