+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 27, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Secretary of State on May 26, 2021
On May 26, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Certificate
- Communication
- Passed notwithstanding objections of the Governor 33-16-0
- Kolterman MO113 prevailed
- Kolterman MO113 Becomes law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor filed
- Returned by Governor without approval on May 25, 2021
On May 21, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021
On May 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-3-8
On May 18, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On May 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Placed on Select File
On May 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On May 10, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
- Date of introduction
+ − Votes (3)
May 26, 2021: MO 113 Kolterman
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 16
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: No
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: No
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: No
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: No
- Tom Brewer: No
- Tom Briese: No
- Steve Erdman: No
- Suzanne Geist: No
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: No
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: No
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: No
- Dave Murman: No
- Julie Slama: No
- Ben Hansen: No
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: No
May 20, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 8
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Present - Not Voting
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: No
- Suzanne Geist: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: No
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Present - Not Voting
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Present - Not Voting
- Dave Murman: Present - Not Voting
- Julie Slama: Present - Not Voting
- Ben Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Present - Not Voting
May 11, 2021: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 9
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Excused - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Present - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Excused - Not Voting
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Present - Not Voting
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Erdman: No
- Suzanne Geist: Excused - Not Voting
- Steve Halloran: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: No
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Excused - Not Voting
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Present - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Excused - Not Voting
- Robert Clements: Excused - Not Voting
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Present - Not Voting
- Julie Slama: Present - Not Voting
- Ben Hansen: Excused - Not Voting
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Present - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Excused - Not Voting
+ − Sponsor
Kolterman
Type:
Primary Sponsor