+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
On May 4, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 04, 2017
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
On May 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On April 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On April 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 25, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 24, 2017
On January 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
On January 9, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor