+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 26, 2015
On May 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 20, 2015
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On May 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On May 5, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On April 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 22, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 29, 2015
On January 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 9, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor