+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 7, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On May 6, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Education AM555 lost
- Groene AM1246 withdrawn
- Friesen MO60 withdrawn
- Friesen MO60 pending
- Friesen MO60 Recommit to the Education Committee filed
- Brandt AM1247 withdrawn
- Linehan AM1203 withdrawn
On May 5, 2021 in the Legislature:
- DeBoer AM1175 withdrawn
- DeBoer AM1199 adopted
- Education AM555 pending
- Linehan AM1203 pending
- Brandt AM1247 filed
- Groene AM1246 filed
On April 29, 2021 in the Legislature:
- DeBoer AM1199 filed
- Linehan AM1203 filed
On April 28, 2021 in the Legislature:
- DeBoer AM1175 filed
On March 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Legislature's Planning Committee priority bill
On March 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Education AM555 filed
- Placed on General File with AM555
On January 25, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 02, 2021
On January 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Kolterman name added
On January 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name added
On January 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hansen, M. name added
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 7, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 6, 2021: AM 555 Education
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: No
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: No
- Dan Hughes: Excused - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: No
- Brett Lindstrom: No
- John McCollister: Present - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Excused - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Excused - Not Voting
- John Stinner: No
- Matt Williams: No
- Joni Albrecht: No
- Carol Blood: No
- Bruce Bostelman: No
- Tom Brewer: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: No
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: No
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Present - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: No
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Present - Not Voting
- Tony Vargas: No
- Lynne Walz: No
- Justin Wayne: No
- Anna Wishart: No
- Robert Clements: No
- John Arch: No
- Tom Brandt: No
- Machaela Cavanaugh: No
- Wendy DeBoer: No
- Myron Dorn: No
- Tim Gragert: No
- Megan Hunt: No
- Mike Moser: No
- Dave Murman: No
- Julie Slama: No
- Ben Hansen: No
- Raymond Aguilar: No
- Eliot Bostar: Present - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: No
- Jen Day: No
- Michael Flood: Present - Not Voting
- Terrell McKinney: No
- Rich Pahls: No
- Rita Sanders: No
May 6, 2021: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Excused - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Present - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: No
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: No
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Hilgers: Present - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: No
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: No
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: No
- Ben Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
May 5, 2021: AM 555 Education - AM 1199 DeBoer
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 8
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Excused - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: No
- Carol Blood: Excused - Not Voting
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Excused - Not Voting
- Steve Erdman: No
- Suzanne Geist: No
- Steve Halloran: No
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: No
- John Lowe: No
- Mike McDonnell: Present - Not Voting
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: No
- John Arch: No
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Excused - Not Voting
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: No
- Ben Hansen: Excused - Not Voting
- Raymond Aguilar: Present - Not Voting
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Excused - Not Voting
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Excused - Not Voting
- Rita Sanders: Excused - Not Voting