+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 23, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Wishart name added
On January 27, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name withdrawn
On January 26, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name added
On January 25, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 23, 2022
On January 24, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction