+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 8, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill.
On June 5, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB126 amended into LB195 by AM656
On February 21, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 12, 2013
On January 22, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 06, 2013 (cancel)
On January 18, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Rereferred to Appropriations Committee
On January 17, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 06, 2013
On January 15, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 11, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor