+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 12, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Communication
- Presented to Governor on February 11, 2013
- Approved by Governor on February 11, 2013
On February 11, 2013 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-4-1
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On February 7, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 6, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Harr AM139 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER3 adopted
- Lautenbaugh FA3 adopted
- Harr AM139 adopted
- Lautenbaugh FA3 filed
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On February 1, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER3 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER3
On January 31, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Avery AM75 adopted
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM47 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Harr AM97 filed
- Harr AM97 adopted
On January 30, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Avery AM75 filed
On January 28, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Murante name added
- Ashford name added
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM47 filed
- Placed on General File with AM47
On January 16, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Chambers name added
- Avery name added
- Notice of hearing for January 24, 2013
On January 15, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 11, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
Harr AM139
adopted
Lautenbaugh FA3
adopted
Enrollment and Review ER3
adopted
Harr AM97
adopted
Avery AM75
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor