+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 3, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Blood name added
On January 29, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 05, 2020
On January 27, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 23, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (2)
McDonnell
Type:
Primary Sponsor