+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 19, 2022
On April 13, 2022 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3
- Presented to Governor on April 13, 2022
On April 11, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Arch AM2776 filed
- Arch AM2627 withdrawn
- Arch AM2776 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 7, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Arch AM2627 filed
On March 2, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 28, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Correction
On February 25, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Arch AM2051 adopted
- Arch AM2051 filed
On February 24, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
- Date of introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 13, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 3
April 11, 2022: AM 2776 Arch
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2022: AM 2051 Arch
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2022: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Arch
Type:
Primary Sponsor