+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB1142 amended into LB1014 by AM2330
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 31, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 15, 2022
On January 26, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name added
On January 21, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On January 19, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (2)
Vargas
Type:
Primary Sponsor