+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 16, 2016 in the Legislature:
- McCoy priority bill
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 17, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Krist name withdrawn
On February 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Krist name added
- Notice of hearing for March 18, 2015
On January 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 9, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor