+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
On April 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On April 9, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST64
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Smith AM2806 adopted
- Smith AM2779 withdrawn
- Enrollment and Review ER159 adopted
On April 4, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Smith AM2806 filed
On April 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Smith AM2779 filed
On March 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File with ER159
- Enrollment and Review ER159 filed
On March 27, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Chambers FA138 adopted
- Chambers FA138 filed
- Smith AM2188 withdrawn
- Revenue AM2049 adopted
On February 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Smith AM2188 filed
On February 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM2049 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2049
On February 20, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Revenue priority bill
On January 31, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 07, 2018
On January 22, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor