+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016
On April 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 01, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
On March 24, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 23, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER204 adopted
On March 21, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER204 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER204
On March 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 5, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 18, 2016
On January 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor