+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 7, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 20, 2014
On February 6, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Harr MO135 withdrawn
- Ashford name added
- Chambers name added
- Conrad name added
- Cook name added
- Nordquist name added
- Schumacher name added
- Bolz name added
- Dubas name added
- Howard name added
- Karpisek name added
- Lathrop name added
- McGill name added
On February 5, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Harr MO135 Withdraw bill filed
On January 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Harr MO135
withdrawn
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor