+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On August 6, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Crawford AM3354 filed
- Linehan AM2860 withdrawn
- Linehan AM3320 filed
- Erdman MO222 withdrawn
- Briese AM3093 withdrawn
- Linehan AM3235 withdrawn
- Linehan AM3320 withdrawn
- Crawford AM3354 pending
- Pansing Brooks MO220 Bracket until August 13, 2020 filed
- Pansing Brooks MO220 withdrawn
- Slama MO221 Bracket until August 13, 2020 filed
- Slama MO221 withdrawn
- Erdman MO222 Bracket until August 13, 2020 filed
On July 30, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Linehan AM3235 filed
On July 20, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for July 27, 2020 on AM3093
- Briese AM3093 filed
On March 11, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Linehan AM2860 filed
On February 21, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Revenue priority bill
On February 4, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 24, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 31, 2020
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 21, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsor
Linehan
Type:
Primary Sponsor