+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On March 26, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM2645 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2645
On March 5, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Kintner name added
On February 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Schilz name added
On February 18, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Wallman name added
- Seiler name added
- Mello name added
- Karpisek name added
- Harms name added
- Hansen name added
- Christensen name added
On February 13, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 28, 2014
On January 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Revenue AM2645
pending
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor