+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016
On April 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 01, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
On March 24, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST78
On March 23, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Stinner AM2728 adopted
- Stinner AM2728 filed
On March 21, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2237 adopted
On February 23, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2237 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2237
On January 25, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 22, 2016
On January 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor