+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
On April 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4
- Thibodeau explanation of vote
On April 6, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST58
On April 4, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Harr AM2706 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER155 adopted
- Harr AM2706 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER155 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER155
On March 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1691 adopted
On February 7, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1691 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1691
On January 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 30, 2018
On January 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
On January 16, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor