+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 30, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 30, 2016
On March 24, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 24, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On March 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST70
On March 17, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER179 adopted
On March 10, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File with ER179
- Enrollment and Review ER179 filed
On March 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Judiciary AM1960 adopted
On February 17, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Fox priority bill
On February 5, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Judiciary AM1960 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1960
On January 28, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Fox name added
On January 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 28, 2016
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 15, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor