+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 18, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB993 amended into LB1003 by AM2651
- Provisions/portions of LB984 amended into LB1003 by AM2651
- Provisions/portions of LB957 amended into LB1003 by AM2651
- Provisions/portions of LB885 amended into LB1003 by AM2651
- Provisions/portions of LB821 amended into LB1003 by AM2651
- Provisions/portions of LB801 amended into LB1003 by AM2651
- Provisions/portions of LB799 amended into LB1003 by AM2651
- Provisions/portions of LB795 amended into LB1003 by AM2651
On August 11, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020
On August 3, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020
On July 31, 2020 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-1-6
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On July 22, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On July 20, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER217 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 23, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Vargas name added
- Hansen, M. name added
- Enrollment and Review ER217 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER217
On March 11, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Urban Affairs AM2651 adopted
On March 6, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Urban Affairs AM2651 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2651
On February 21, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Wayne name added
- Urban Affairs priority bill
On February 19, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name added
On January 27, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 18, 2020
On January 21, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Urban Affairs Committee
On January 15, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (3)
July 31, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Present - Not Voting
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: No
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Present - Not Voting
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
March 11, 2020: AM 2651 Urban Affairs
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 8
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Excused - Not Voting
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Present - Not Voting
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Present - Not Voting
- Carol Blood: Excused - Not Voting
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Excused - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Excused - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Excused - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Excused - Not Voting
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
March 11, 2020: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 8
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Excused - Not Voting
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Present - Not Voting
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Present - Not Voting
- Carol Blood: Excused - Not Voting
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Excused - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Excused - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Present - Not Voting
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Excused - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Excused - Not Voting
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
+ − Sponsors (4)
Walz
Type:
Primary Sponsor