+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 2, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
- McCoy MO1 prevailed
On February 10, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 16, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 26, 2015
On January 14, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to General Affairs Committee
On January 13, 2015 in the Legislature:
- McCoy MO1 Indefinitely postpone filed
On January 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
McCoy MO1
prevailed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor