+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover resolution
On January 25, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 01, 2021
On January 22, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to General Affairs Committee
On January 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Lindstrom
Type:
Primary Sponsor