+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 26, 2015
On February 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 20, 2015
On February 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0
On February 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 11, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On January 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On January 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 22, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 20, 2015
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 8, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor