+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB996 amended into LB977 by AM2318
- Provisions/portions of LB844 amended into LB977 by AM2318
- Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
- Provisions/portions of LB799 amended into LB977 by AM2318
- Provisions/portions of LB989 amended into LB977 by AM2318
- Provisions/portions of LB872 amended into LB977 by AM2318
- Provisions/portions of LB918 amended into LB977 by AM2318
- Provisions/portions of LB946 amended into LB977 by AM2318
On April 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn
- President/Speaker signed
On April 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed
On March 24, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST77
On March 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Chambers FA104 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER189 adopted
- Smith AM2478 withdrawn
- Smith AM2623 adopted
- Chambers FA104 adopted
- Chambers FA105 filed
- Chambers FA105 withdrawn
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 17, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Smith AM2623 filed
On March 15, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER189 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER189
On March 9, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM2318 adopted
- Smith AM2478 withdrawn
- Smith AM2478 refiled
- Pansing Brooks AM2489 filed
- Pansing Brooks AM2489 adopted
- Smith AM1895 withdrawn
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 8, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Smith AM2478 filed
On March 2, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM2318 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2318
On February 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill
On January 26, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Smith AM1895 filed
On January 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 01, 2016
On January 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 14, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor