+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 16, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 29, 2021
On January 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name added
On January 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 7, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (2)
DeBoer
Type:
Primary Sponsor