+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 21, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Education AM1597 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1597
On January 16, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Howard name added
- Walz name added
- Baker name added
On January 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 23, 2018
On January 9, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction