+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016
On April 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 01, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On March 23, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER199 adopted
On March 21, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER199 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER199
On March 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 28, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 15, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 26, 2016
On January 14, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Agriculture Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor