+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 28, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Williams name added
On January 26, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 03, 2016
On January 14, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor