+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On March 21, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Attorney General Opinion 18-001 to Kuehn
On February 14, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Erdman priority bill
On January 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Lowe name added
On January 22, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Groene name added
On January 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 25, 2018
On January 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Halloran name added
- Briese name added
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 5, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Brewer name added
On January 4, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction