+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 1, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Wayne explanation of vote
On February 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 28, 2018
On February 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 23, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4
- Chambers FA107 withdrawn
- Chambers FA107 filed
- Motion to return to Select File failed
On February 14, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 12, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Chambers MO209 failed
- Enrollment and Review ER103 adopted
- Chambers AM1866 filed
- Chambers AM1866 lost
- Chambers MO209 Reconsider the vote on AM1866 filed
- Chambers MO211 Reconsider the vote to indefinitely postpone filed
- Chambers MO184 failed
- Chambers MO211 failed
- Hughes MO210 Invoke cloture filed
- Hughes MO210 prevailed
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On January 31, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER103 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER103
On January 30, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Chambers FA92 lost
- Chambers MO186 failed
- Chambers MO192 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed
- Chambers MO192 failed
- Natural Resources AM1573 adopted
- Chambers MO193 Reconsider the vote on FA92 filed
- Hughes MO194 Invoke cloture filed
- Hughes MO194 prevailed
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Chambers MO193 failed
On January 25, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Chambers MO186 pending
- Chambers MO186 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed
- Chambers FA92 pending
On January 24, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Chambers FA92 filed
- Natural Resources AM1573 pending
- Chambers MO184 Indefinitely postpone filed
- Chambers FA92 pending
- Groene name added
On January 22, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Natural Resources priority bill
- Natural Resources AM1573 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1573
On January 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 17, 2018
On January 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Natural Resources Committee
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor