+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
- Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
On April 12, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
On April 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 31, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Cavanaugh, M. FA88 withdrawn
- Enrollment and Review ER115 adopted
On March 10, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Cavanaugh, M. FA88 filed
On March 9, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Wayne name added
On March 2, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER115 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER115
On February 28, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- General Affairs AM341 adopted
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On March 1, 2021 in the Legislature:
- General Affairs AM341 filed
- Placed on General File with AM341
On January 21, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Murman name added
On January 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 25, 2021
On January 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to General Affairs Committee
On January 7, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
April 12, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2022: AM 341 General Affairs
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2022: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2