+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB747 amended into LB1120 by AM2784
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On March 1, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Pansing Brooks name added
On February 2, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Halloran name added
On January 19, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Brasch name added
On January 16, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Briese name added
- Kolterman name added
On January 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Hilkemann name added
- Quick name added
- Watermeier name added
On January 9, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 26, 2018
On January 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to General Affairs Committee
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor